Call me

Have a Query? We will call you right away.

+91

E.g: 9876543210, 01112345678

We will give you a call shortly, Thank You

Office hours: 9:00 am to 9:00 pm IST (7 days a week)

What are you looking for?

Syllabus

what is the full form of sanskrit?

ajeet gupta is a bad boy .... please stop him .... meritnation experts, we need your help .....

but how for others

I have got 8 expert thumbs up then also I am not getting enlightened gold badge.Why?

it is nice and simple .

really works

good method

88*89 how it will be calculated as per vedic maths

please explain how to multiply big numbers such as 368 x 629 using vedic math methords.

solve 995*993

378 multiply by 497. what is very easy method to solve this problem????

66X67=4422

But as per vedic math answer is 4242.

Dear meritnation experts,please correct it.

Is there any method in vedic mathematics to multiply two double digit numbers who have their first digit is different and the sum of their last digit is not 10?

how to write 11 thousand 11hundred 11

how to multiply 78 and 82 using vedic maths

In the

2ndexample the question is to calculate 66 x 64 and answer is 4224.But (6 x 7) (6 x 4

)isnotequal to 4224.Is it write or just my mistake????

What is multiplication of 999 x 777.

rnwhy do you sudract 1 when there is no carry over in the method one number is lesser than the base and other is greater than the base

can u solve this by shortest vedic maths formulae - 99*98

can i get the names of all the sutra of vedic maths.

Explain why when we multiply two negative numbers we get a positive number?

WHAT IS THE FULL FORM OF MATHS ?

95*95

by vedic maths

what about 66*48

what would be the base

also tell about 44*56

please tell

What is 56756765435643 x 99999999999999. It is a challenge for all!!

can anyone explain multiplication of 2-digits,using vedic maths

give a magic square

Multiply 12 and 15 using this method of multiplication and also give a detailed explanation to support your answer.

someone plz help me with 34 * 49 = ?

if f(x)=x+7andg(4x-1)andg:r>r is given by g(x)=x3+2 then the value of (gof)(1) is

In multiplication method 1, they have asked to take the nearest number closer to the two numbers given which also has 1 and ends in 0s.in the case of 33*93 which number will we take as the base?

can any1 tell me what's the right ans. of123+123-123*123/123??????????bakwas ek dum.......

itna sochne se acha to 2 min. me karke hi dekhle.....

atleast aisa to nai lagega na ki koi mistake hui h..............

how to multiply 55* 66

didn't u get any more difficult method thn it??????????

so that students can be in more paradox !!!!!!!!!!!

just try to think that when a teacher can't study all topicsof maths thn how a single student can learn all d difficult topics of this type..........

plz try to invent some new methods involving easy n simple steps..so dat the studnts can understand well ...

in simple words i wanna say dat d older method adopted by d students is moreeeee convinient ......!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

plzz try to add new study material n video clips,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,i hope u will be concerned wid dis problem

if the arithmetic mean and geometric mean of two numbers are in the ratio 5:4 and the sum of the two numbers is 30 then find these numbers?

please answer this as soon as possible............

i was multiplying two numbers the first number was125 x 97 i followed the usual method but when we have to subtract 100 from the two surplus normally we have to minus when it show minus sign but it showed plus sign so i added it and then continued and finally i got the answer as 12125 it was correct but when i did the same method for the second number i.e 112x93 i got 10316 i followed the method i used in the first number when i checked the answer i got 10416 in the calculator when i got the ans. as 10316 i want to know through the meritnation experts where i did the mistake and was my method right and is there a different method for sums like this i.e 112x93 pls see the method i have done below

if the sum of the unit's place numbers is not 10 then is this method possible?

ans fast please.

64 x 98

what will b the sum of

1+2+3+4+5+6+7+8+9+10=...

do it without any calculation

how can we multiply very very larger number with smaller number

plz find answer 49*99 in vedic method

how to calculate the square of the larger no. like 999*9999

oh my gosh i dint understand i hate math who invented math why did he invent who was he ? oh my god why error i want to write i will write

this method is wrong

25*38=840 by the vedic method

but the answer is 950

plz help me out.....................

we can find square of any number by this method ?

I CAN'T UNDERSTAND THE VALUE OF P AND PLEASE SOLVE THIS MULTIPICATION WHICH IS RELATED TO 4th ONE. 48 x 59.this is just superb..........

once i master it i can solve any mathematical problem just as easily and smoothly as it is when walking on a cake......

i tried vedic maths multiplication system many time but i am not finding the answer can any one plzz help me out !!!

Could we take 40 or 30 as baseHow can we multiply 198*42?

What should the base be?

Can we do it with this method?

what is the easy formula of multiplying numbers at tens place

how can we multiply 99 x 94 using vedic maths.

(using multiplication method 1 given in the video -second topic under multiplication in vedic maths)