find the product by suitable arrangments 1, 2 x 1768 x 50 , 2, 4x 166 x 25, 3, 8 x 291 x 125 , 4 , 625 x 279 x 16 ,5 , 285 x 5 x 60 , 6 , 125 x 40 x 8 x 25

**1)**

We have, 2 x 1768 x 50. It is solved as:

2 x 1768 x 50 = 1768 x (2 x 50) = 1768 x 100 = 176800

**4)**

We have, 625 x 279 x 16. It is solved as:

625 x 279 x 16 = (625 x 16) x 279 = 10000 x 279 = 2790000

**6) **

We have, 125 x 40 x 8 x 25. It is solved as:

125 x 40 x 8 x 25 = (125 x 40 ) x (8 x 25)

= (5000) x (200) = 1000000

Due to paucity of time it would not be possible for us to provide the answers to all your queries. We are providing solutions to some your good queries. Try solving rest of the questions yourself and if you face any difficulty then do get back to us.

**
**